+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 27, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Table
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Shurtleff): MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 78
- Ought to Pass: MF RC 169-164 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 76
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HC 14 P. 47
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-7; RC) HC 14 P. 47
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law HJ 4 P. 24
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 AM LOB 308
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 12:45 PM LOB 308
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 11:00 AM LOB308
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: OTP
- Yeas: 169
- Nays: 164
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor