+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): MA RC 192-179 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 81
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/09/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC)
On January 24, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2024 09:45 am LOB 206-208
- Executive Session: 02/09/2024 11:30 am LOB 206-208
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs