+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 49
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 AM LOB 307
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 8-0; CC) HC 14 P. 29
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Legislative Administration HJ 4 P. 24
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 10:30 AM LOB 303
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor