+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep Hopper): MA DV 257-23; HJ 26, PG. 1271
- Removed from Consent (Rep Abramson); HJ 24, PG. 766
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC19, PG. 404
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 LOB 208
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM LOB 208
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; HJ 12, PG. 234
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor