+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 145
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0817h: MF RC 220-116 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 143
- Amendment #2016-0817h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 142
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0817h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-8; RC) HC 14 P. 57
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 AM LOB 208
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary HJ 4 P. 24
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 01:00 PM LOB 208
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: OTPA
- Yeas: 220
- Nays: 116