+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2025 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 204-163 02/13/2025 HJ 5 P. 34
On February 4, 2025 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/31/2025 (Vote 12-6; RC) HC 11 P. 14
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On January 22, 2025 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/31/2025 01:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 15, 2025 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2025 01:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 13, 2025 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/09/2025 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs HJ 3 P. 14
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor