+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 192-162 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 6
- Special Order (Rep. Ley): MA VV 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 6
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 10-8; RC) HC 16 P. 35
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 206
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 206
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 11:00 am LOB 206
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm LOB 206
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs HJ 3 P. 24
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: OTP
- Yeas: 192
- Nays: 162
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 34