+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 22, PG. 569
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 13-0; CC); HC18, PG. 353
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2015 10:00 AM or one hour after House Session ends LOB 303
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:15 AM LOB 303
- Vacated from Legislative Administration and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; HJ 14, PG. 273
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; HJ 12, PG. 227
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor