+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Lay HCR2 on Table (Rep. C. McGuire): MA DV 299-55 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 91
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/15/2023 (Vote 13-7; RC) HC 16 P. 29
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor