+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 262-75; HJ 26, PG. 1249-1251
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 7-3; RC); HC19, PG. 433
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 8:15 AM LOB 104
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:30 AM LOB 203
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; HJ 7, PG. 118
+ − Vote
March 12, 2015: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 262
- Nays: 75