+ − Actions (5)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 32
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 18 P. 15
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor