+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 95; Eff. 8/7/2017
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2017 HJ 17 P. 127
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); SJ 19
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1461s (Rep. J. Belanger): MA VV 05/18/2017 HJ 16 P. 6
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1461s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/27/2017; SJ 15
- Committee Amendment #2017-1461s, AA, VV; 04/27/2017; SJ 15
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1461s, 04/27/2017; SC 20
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/15/2017, Room 102, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 13
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 7
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/02/2017 HJ 5 P. 6
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/02/2017 (Vote 15-0; CC) HC 9 P. 5
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM LOB 301
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 10:30 AM LOB 301
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 2 P. 16
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor