+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On May 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 18
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0472h: AA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 27
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0472h: MA DV 317-45 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 27
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0472h 02/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; RC) HC 15 P. 10
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 11, 2023: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor