+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to the beginning of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 04/13/2023; SJ 13
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; SJ 13
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/13/2023; SC 17A
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/06/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 12
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 199-185 03/23/2023 HJ 11 P. 25
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/08/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 16 P. 36
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 13, 2023: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor