+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Soucy Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:40 am; SC 14
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 13
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 9
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0118h: AA VV 02/02/2023 HJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0118h: MA VV 02/02/2023 HJ 4
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0118h 01/25/2023 (Vote 18-1; CC) HC 9 P. 4
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/25/2023 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 03:00 pm LOB 301-303
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government