+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 7, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:15 am LOB 305-307
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/15/2023 03:00 pm LOB 305-307
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2023 11:00 am LOB305-307
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2023 02:30 pm LOB 305-307
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 02:30 pm LOB 305-307
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services