+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 177; eff: 10/03/2023 HJ 17
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to HB 75 to the end of the House Bills, Without Objection, MA; 06/29/2023; SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Weber): MF DV 185-186 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 7
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2023-2229c; RC 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/29/2023; SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2023-2229c: Adopted, DV 186-185 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 7
On June 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Soucy; SJ 20
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2023-2229c; 06/29/2023
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/21/2023 02:00 pm LOB 301-303
- Conferee Change: Rep. S. Smith Replaces Rep. Stavis 06/21/2023 HJ 16 P. 16
On June 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Abbas; SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1741s (Rep. L. Turcotte): MF DV 185-188 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 3
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1741s (Rep. L. Turcotte): MF DV 185-188 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 3
- Lay HB75 on Table (Rep. Weber): MF DV 186-188 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 3
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1741s and Requests CofC (Rep. L. Turcotte): MA DV 188-186 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 3
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. L. Turcotte, Pauer, Lascelles, Stavis 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 3
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
- President Appoints: Senators Gray, Abbas, Soucy; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1741s, RC 14Y-10N, AA; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1741s, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1630s, AF, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1630s, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/02/2023, Room 103, LOB, 10:31 am, on proposed amendment # 2023-1552s; SC 20
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 14
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 13
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 9
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/02/2023 HJ 4
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/25/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 9 P. 4
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/19/2023 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 02:15 pm LOB 301-303
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 29, 2023: Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
May 11, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
May 11, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea