+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-3; RC) HC 23 P. 8
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm LOB 306
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm LOB 306
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 61
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2813h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 61
- Amendment # 2019-2813h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 61
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2813h (NT) (Vote 11-2; RC) HC 50 P. 17
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 206
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm LOB 206
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm LOB 206
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 3 P. 27
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor