+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 14
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-1; CC) HC 13 P. 9
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 3 P. 26