+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 7
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 129
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; RC) HC 50 P. 24
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm LOB 205
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 26