+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 190-189 03/22/2023
- Reconsider HB69 (Rep. Hoell): MA DV 193-185 03/22/2023
- Lay HB69 on Table (Rep. Weber): MA RC 192-187 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 106
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/08/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 16 P. 31
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
+ − Vote
March 22, 2023: OTP
- Yeas: 190
- Nays: 189
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 17