+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 842
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-5; RC); HC19, PG. 416
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 11:30 AM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 235
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor