+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 788-789
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 22-1; CC); HC19, PG. 401
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2015 11:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 3/2/2015 3:15 PM LOB 212
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Finance
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0354h: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 501-502
- Amendment #0354h: AA VV; HJ 20, PG. 501-502
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0354h (NT) for Feb 18 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC13, PG. 240
- Executive Session: 2/12/2015 LOB 205
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 9:00 AM LOB 205
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 3:00 PM LOB 205
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 234
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor