+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 04/26/2023; Chapter 3; Eff: 04/26/23
On April 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 04/13/2023); SJ 14
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/22/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 14
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0435h: AA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0435h: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 6
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0435h 02/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 5
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor