+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/19/2019 HJ 10 P. 14
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 6
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm LOB 302-304
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm LOB 302
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am LOB 302
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:45 am LOB 302
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 3 P. 23