+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-2279h
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2279h for Jan 8 (Vote 21-0, RC)
On September 4, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/10/2013 11:00 AM LOB 210-211
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/10/2013 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
- Full Committee Work Session: 2/12/2013 1:45 PM LOB 210-211
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:30 AM LOB 210-211
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Finance; HJ 12, PG.205