+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 788
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 24-0; CC); HC19, PG. 401
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 3/2/2015 3:00 PM LOB 209
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 2/17/2015 11:15 AM LOB 209
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- =CANCELLED=Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/9/2015 3:30 PM LOB 209
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 2/9/2015 3:30 PM LOB 209
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Public Hearing: 2/4/2015 1:15 PM LOB 210-211
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/2/2015 10:30 AM LOB 210-211 ==RECESSED==
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance; HJ 12, PG. 234