+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
- Executive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation HJ 3 P. 24
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor