+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 26-0; CC)
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On September 11, 2017 in the House:
- Division III Retained Bill Work Session: 09/28/2017 01:00 PM LOB 212
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
- ==RESCHEDULED== Division III Work Session: 03/07/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/13/2017 01:00 PM LOB 210-211
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 03/01/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
- ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/06/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
- ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 21
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0347h: MA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 21
- Amendment #2017-0347h: AA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 21
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0347h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 14-0; RC) HC 11 P. 17
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM LOB 206
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM LOB 206
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 3 P. 23