+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 199; eff: I. Sec 2 eff as prov in sec 3 II. Rem eff 8/4/23 HJ 17
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1533s (Reps. Layon, W. MacDonald): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 2
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1533s, AA, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1533s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1533s, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/05/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0940h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 22
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0940h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 22
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0940h (NT) 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 11
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2023 09:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 23
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor