+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 60
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB641-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 49 P. 17
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 22, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor