+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2839h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 47
- Amendment # 2019-2839h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 47
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (NT) (Vote 14-0; CC) HC 50
On October 18, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On September 3, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 09:00 am LOB 307
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 09:00 am LOB 307
- Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 3 P. 23
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor