+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB633-FN 02/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 10
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/06/2023 01:30 pm LOB 302-304
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/23/2023 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Executive Session: 01/24/2023 04:00 pm LOB 302-304
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 3 P. 23