+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG.672
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; HC 20, PG.417
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 11-7; Part I RC); HC 20, PG.417
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 AM LOB 303
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:00 PM LOB 303
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; HJ 12, PG.203