+ − Actions (5)
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am LOB 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/19/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98257633759 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation HJ 2 P. 57
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor