+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA RC 198-141
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-7; RC); HC 1
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM LOB 306
On October 15, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:00 AM LOB 306
On August 27, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 AM LOB 306
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 AM LOB 306
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM LOB 306
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2013 10:00 AM LOB 306
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM LOB 306
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM LOB 306
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG.203
+ − Vote
January 22, 2014: ITL
- Yeas: 198
- Nays: 141