+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 275-64; HJ 22, PG. 615-617
- Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); HJ 22, PG. 559
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC18, PG. 346
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 AM LOB 308
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 AM LOB 308
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Election Law; HJ 12, PG. 233
+ − Vote
March 4, 2015: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 275
- Nays: 64