+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 11-8; RC); HC 67, PG. 19
On October 8, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:30 AM LOB 207
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/1/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 6/2/2015 9:30 AM LOB 207
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 9:30 AM LOB 207
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/12/2015 9:30 AM LOB 207
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 AM LOB 207
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:45 AM LOB 207
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG. 233