+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 77; Eff. 6/2/2017
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/04/2017 HJ 15 P. 47
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); SJ 16
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/27/2017; SJ 15
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/27/2017; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/12/2017, Room 101, LOB, 10:30 am; SC 18
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 11
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0659h: MA VV 03/23/2017 HJ 11 P. 7
- Amendment #2017-0659h: AA VV 03/23/2017 HJ 11 P. 7
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0659h for 03/23/2017 (Vote 25-0; CC) HC 16 P. 3
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 02/28/2017 11:30 AM LOB 212
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0336h: MA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 12
- Amendment #2017-0336h: AA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 12
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0336h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 11 P. 10
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 AM LOB 306
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:00 AM LOB 306
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 3 P. 22
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor