+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0121; Effective 6/16/2014
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Concur with Senate Amendment #0043s, (Rep Gile); MA VV
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0043s, NT, MA VV; OT3rdg
- Committee Amendment 0043s, NT, Sections 3-5 and 6, AA VV
- Committee Amendment 0043s, NT, Sections 1-2 and 6, AA VV
- The Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 1-2, and 6 and Sections 3-5, and 6
- Sen. Pierce Moved to Divide the Question: Section 1-2, and 6 and Section 3-5, and 6
- Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0043s, 2/3 necessary, MA;
- Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0043s, NT, 1/30/14; SC4
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV;
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/2/13; SC18
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, SH, 1:45 p.m.; SC14
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h: MA DIV 281-28; HJ29, PG.990
- Amendment #0559h: AA VV; HJ29, PG.990
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0559h; HC 23 PG.641
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h for Mar 20 (Vote 17-3; Part II, RC); HC 23 PG.589-590
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 AM LOB 207
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 10:30 AM LOB 303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig LOB 207)==
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG.203
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor