+ − Actions (7)
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am LOB 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am LOB 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98448475898 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 2 P. 57