+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2023 09:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 09:00 am LOB 201-203
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 22