+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. White): MA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 28
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 10-8; RC) HC 11 P. 18
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM LOB 207
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:00 AM LOB 207
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 21