+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 74; Eff. 7/18/2016
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 46
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); SJ 17
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; SJ 14
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; SC 15
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/15/2016, Room 100, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 10
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 6
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2527h: MA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 58
- Amendment #2015-2527h: AA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 58
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2527h for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; RC); HC 67, PG. 14
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:15 AM LOB 305
On September 8, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:45 AM LOB 302
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM LOB 302
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 AM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 232