+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 34; Eff: 05/15/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); SJ 15
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/11/2019 HJ 13 P. 127
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 17
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 16
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 10
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0780h: MA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 10
- FLAM # 2019-0780h (Rep. Williams): AA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 10
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Williams) 03/07/2019 HJ 8 P. 3
- Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection HJ 8 P. 60
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 18-1; CC) HC 14 P. 3
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 09:30 am LOB 302
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am LOB 302
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:45 pm LOB 302
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 3 P. 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor