+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MF DV 172-200 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 41
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 41
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation HB597-FN 01/31/2023 (Vote ; RC) HC 11 P. 16
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
- Executive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 12, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation HJ 3 P. 22