+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 200; Effective 1/1/2016
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ 54, PG. 2102
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1491s (Rep Tholl): MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1812
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1491s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
- Committee Amendment 1491s, AA, VV
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1491s, 5/7/15; SC20
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, SH, 9:00 a.m.; SC15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0313h: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 852
- Amendment #0313h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 852
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0313h for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; RC); HC19, PG. 418
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 AM LOB 204
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommit (Rep Tholl): MA VV; HJ 16, PG. 307
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 11 (Vote 11-5; RC); HC11, PG. 179
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM LOB 204
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:30 PM LOB 204
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; HJ 12, PG. 231
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor