+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 13Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2016; SJ 15
- Special Order HB 594 to the present time, Without Objection, MA; SJ 15
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/28/2016; SC 16
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/01/2016, Room 103, SH, 10:15 am; SC7
- Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 6
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2481h: MA DV 182-137 01/20/2016 HJ 8 P. 23
- Amendment #2015-2481h: AA VV 01/20/2016 HJ 8 P. 23
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2481h for Jan 6 (Vote 12-7; RC); HC 67, PG. 28-29
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 3:00 PM LOB 202
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/29/2015 11:00 AM LOB 202
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 11:00 AM LOB 202
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 9/15/2015 11:00 AM LOB 202
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/10/2015 3:00 PM LOB 202
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2015 3:00 PM LOB 202
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:00 PM LOB 202
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 12, PG. 231
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 28, 2016: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor