+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 294; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 09/27/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2019
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 56
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2019-2559c, Adopted, VV; 06/27/2019; SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2559c: Adopted, VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 32
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2559c; 06/27/2019
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 09:30 am LOB 203
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Watters, Hennessey, Birdsell; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
- Sen. Watters Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; (In recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1852s and Requests CofC (Rep. Sykes): MA VV 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 11
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sykes, Pickering, O'Brien, Steven Smith 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 11
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1852s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1852s, AA, VV; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1852s, 05/15/2019; SC 22
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, LOB, 02:00 pm; SC 16
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 10
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 202-116 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 44
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 15-4; RC) HC 15 P. 13
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm LOB 203
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:30 am LOB 203
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 3 P. 21
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: OTP
- Yeas: 202
- Nays: 116
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 66
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor