+ − Actions (6)
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 09/23/2021 03:00 pm LOB 305-307
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 09/16/2021 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
- Executive Session: 03/04/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92992494588
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/11/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 2 P. 55